BRACKNELL FOREST FEDERATION OF COMMUNITY GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide advice & information to community groups. To act as a forum for discussion. To represent the community sector on appropriate partnerships and/or strategic bodies. To promote dialogue between community groups & partner agencies. To establish & foster links with related groups. To establish working groups to look at specific issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bracknell Forest
Governance
- 20 October 2006: Standard registration
- 08 July 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26 | £1 | £1.69k | £132 | £148 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.07k | £104 | £110 | £357 | £365 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 30 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 30 July 2013 | 180 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 18 February 2012 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 DECEMBER 2005 AMENDED ON 28 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FORGOING A) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT; AND B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY IDENTIFYING AND PROMOTING GOOD PRACTICE IN COMMUNITY EDUCATION AND THEREBY DEVELOPING THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE SAID INHABITANTS IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. THE FEDERATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. BRACKNELL FOREST BOROUGH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window