FRIENDS OF PICU
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF THE PATIENTS OF THE PAEDIATRIC INTENSIVE CARE UNIT AT SOUTHAMPTON GENERAL HOSPITAL, BY PROVIDING, OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF, SPECIALIST EQUIPMENT, IMPROVED FACILITIES AND SERVICES THAT ARE NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL HEALTH AUTHORITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Devon
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Isle Of Wight
- Northamptonshire
- Oxfordshire
- Somerset
- Surrey
- West Sussex
- Wiltshire
- Guernsey
- Jersey
Governance
- 20 November 2006: Standard registration
- 26 January 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- FOPICU (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £253.28k | £210.01k | £291.52k | £547.96k | £258.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £143.61k | £221.11k | £109.42k | £98.42k | £751.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £516.36k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £42.02k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £370 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £32.36k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £66.05k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 31 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 31 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 29 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2017
(These accounts |
29 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 31 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2016
(These accounts |
31 January 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF THE PATIENTS OF THE PAEDIATRIC INTENSIVE CARE UNIT AT SOUTHAMPTON GENERAL HOSPITAL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN PROVIDING OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES
Area of benefit
SOUTHAMPTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window