ACE CARDIFF LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
After-school classes for Literacy & Numeracy, KS2, KS3 & KS4 from Butetown and surrounding areas. English Classes for Speakers of Other Languages in Ely.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cardiff
Governance
- 13 November 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robyn Mercer-Davies | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosalia Alina Trigger | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Luay Karrar | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emily White | Trustee | 13 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Helen Edgeworth | Trustee | 18 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY HOLLETT | Trustee | 18 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.57k | £41.71k | £20.55k | £85.98k | £93.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.65k | £47.86k | £48.49k | £76.82k | £90.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £1.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 09 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 09 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 06 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 06 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 06 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 06 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 20 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 20 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/06/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/11/2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE INCLUDING UNEMPLOYMENT, PRINCIPALLY IN CARDIFF AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
CARDIFF AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
113-116 BUTE STREET
CARDIFF
CF10 5EQ
- Phone:
- 07760177745
- Email:
- info@acecardiff.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window