OXYGEN THERAPY CENTRE CARDIGAN LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a facility for oxygen treatment, physiotherapy and massage, and use of exercise equipment by members. The centre also provides a meeting place for social interaction and an environment where people can meet in a friendly atmosphere.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Carmarthenshire
- Ceredigion
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 11 September 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jean Williams | Trustee | 22 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ian Dixon Morgan | Trustee | 22 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
William Hopkins | Trustee | 22 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREA ROBINA PRINCE | Trustee | 20 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
MAIR MONINGTON REES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP FRANK SIMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.29k | £46.29k | £44.20k | £46.10k | £57.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.20k | £35.83k | £33.74k | £46.13k | £43.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £1.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 23 August 2024 | 176 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 23 August 2024 | 176 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 04 March 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 04 March 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A HYPERBARIC OXYGEN CHAMBER AND OTHER EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES NOT PROVIDED FROM STATUTORY FUNDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE CEREDIGION, NORTH PEMBROKESHIRE, NORTH WEST CARMARTHENSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
OXYGEN THERAPY CENTRE
UNIT 13
PENTOOD INDUSTRIAL ESTATE
CARDIGAN
DYFED
SA43 3AG
- Phone:
- 01239613210
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window