THE EXTON AND BRIDGETOWN VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes community social, recreational, and administrative activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Somerset
Governance
- 28 December 2006: Standard registration
- EXE VALLEY MEETING PLACE (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tonia Matthews | Chair | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Molloy | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Frances Williams | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Debi Oliver | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE THELMA TAKLE | Trustee | 26 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
LINDA HARRIS | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
MRS JUDI WEAVER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.26k | £329 | £180 | £1.32k | £1.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.31k | £1.64k | £1.73k | £2.31k | £3.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 AUGUST 2006 AS AMENDED 30 OCTOBER 2006 AND 13 NOVEMBER 2008.
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE A. TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE EXTON, BRIDGETOWN AND SURROUNDING AREA, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; B. TO SECURE THE MAINTENANCE AND DEVELOPMENT OF A COMMUNITY HALL AND TO EQUIP AND MANAGE THE SAME WHETHER ALONE OR IN COOPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS; C. TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
EXTON, BRIDGETOWN AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Exe Valley Caravan Site
Bridgetown
DULVERTON
Somerset
TA22 9JL
- Phone:
- 01643851432
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window