HERITAGE PARK HOME SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of pupils in Heritage Park Community School in particular by: 1) Developing effective relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school. 2) Engaging in activities or providing facilites or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the puils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2014
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 22 December 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tony Middleton | Chair | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Donna Ellerby | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
DIANE TALFORD | Trustee | 09 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS COONAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.19k | £10.81k | £48.91k | £20.05k | £9.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.82k | £10.81k | £48.91k | £17.05k | £8.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 676 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 676 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1041 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1041 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1406 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1406 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1771 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1771 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 3 JULY 2006 AS AMENDED ON 28 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN HERITAGE PARK COMMUNITY SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY:- 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; AND 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
HERITAGE PARK COMMUNITY SCHOOL AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
HERITAGE PARK COMMUNITY SCHOOL
NORFOLK PARK ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S2 2RU
- Phone:
- 01142796850
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window