PRIVATE EQUITY FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Private Equity Foundation transforms the lives of young people from disadvantaged backgrounds by ensuring they get the right support to succeed in school, in work and in life. We find, fund and build the most promising charities working with these young people, providing core funding and working shoulder-to-shoulder with their leaders to help them become stronger organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 September 2006: Standard registration
- 18 January 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE PRIVATE EQUITY FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.10m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.16m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.09m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £723.72k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £8.19k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £280.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.40m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £483.51k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £636.13k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 26 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 17 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/07/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/11/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/04/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/09/2008 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23/01/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE ALL PURPOSES RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window