THE VICTORIAN MILITARY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE FURTHERANCE OF THE STUDY OF THE HISTORY OF THE MILITARY LIFE OF THE VICTORIAN ERA, WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE BRITISH ARMY AND THE ARMIES OF THE BRITISH EMPIRE. THE PERIOD COVERED IS BETWEEN 1837 AND 1914. THE SOCIETY IS INVOLVED IN LECTURES, EXHIBITIONS AND ASSISTANCE WITH RESEARCH BY MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC INTO FAMILY HISTORY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 November 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Vincent Robert Smith FRHistS | Chair | 09 September 2006 |
|
|
||||
David Snape FRHistS | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Winrow FRHistS | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
LESLIE CHARLES ALLEN | Trustee | 09 September 2006 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.66k | £6.42k | £4.29k | £8.15k | £8.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.96k | £6.29k | £5.72k | £11.44k | £5.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 March 2024 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 February 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 9 SEPTEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE FURTHERANCE OF THE STUDY OF THE HISTORY OF THE MILITARY LIFE OF THE VICTORIAN ERA WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE BRITISH ARMY, AT HOME AND OVERSEAS, AND, TO A LESSER EXTENT, THE ARMIES OF OTHER COUNTRIES. THE PERIOD OF COVERAGE IS FROM 1837 TO 1914
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Floral Court
ASHTEAD
Surrey
KT21 2JL
- Phone:
- 07737271676
- Email:
- victorianmilitary@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window