GREATWOOD CHARITY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rescue, Rehabilitation, Rehoming of Ex-Racehorses Helping children, young people and adults with disabilities and/or special educational needs and/or are underprivileged using ex-racehorses as a vehicle to teach children, young people and adults life skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income:
£729,572
Donations and legacies | £503.78k | |
Charitable activities | £162.45k | |
Other trading activities | £33.35k | |
Investments | £14.25k | |
Other | £15.74k |
Total expenditure:
£670,215
Raising funds | £60.09k | |
Charitable activities | £610.13k | |
Other | £0 |
£10,911 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £6,160 from 1 government contract(s) and £9,261 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £60.09k | |
Charitable expenditure | £610.13k | |
Retained for future use | £59.36k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £60.09k | |
Charitable expenditure | £610.13k | |
Retained for future use | £70.27k |
People

12 Employee(s)
4 Trustee(s)
54 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Animals
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- GREATWOOD CARING FOR RETIRED RACEHORSES LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COUNCILLOR IAN JAMES | Trustee | 26 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
HELEN MARY YEADON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD WILLIAM POWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALISON KAREN COCKS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £589.42k | £701.11k | £636.65k | £614.23k | £729.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £585.58k | £528.71k | £615.49k | £640.49k | £670.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.44k | £2.08k | £5.88k | £3.43k | £6.16k | |
|
Income from government grants | £34.25k | £11.78k | £15.86k | N/A | £9.26k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £372.95k | £465.23k | £443.64k | £409.16k | £503.78k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £69.91k | £23.24k | £39.53k | £32.95k | £33.35k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £137.47k | £203.80k | £142.45k | £157.25k | £162.45k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £818 | £367 | £221 | £3.32k | £14.25k | |
|
Income - Other | £8.27k | £8.48k | £10.81k | £11.56k | £15.74k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £125.97k | £191.00k | £205.97k | £240.49k | £327.35k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £467.90k | £401.64k | £470.14k | £576.79k | £610.13k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £117.68k | £127.07k | £145.35k | £63.70k | £60.09k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £7.75k | £7.44k | £7.44k | £8.10k | £10.54k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £95.26k | £119.25k | £136.15k | £90.52k | £113.58k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £65.47k | £76.38k | |
|
Other assets | £566.55k | £713.80k | £723.49k | £697.90k | £751.60k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £23.29k | £22.12k | £27.55k | £26.23k | £43.63k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/08/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/04/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17 NOV 2017 as amended on 10 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
(A) THE WELFARE OF SICK, NEGLECTED, INJURED AND RETIRED RACEHORSES AND THEIR RELIEF FROM SUFFERING (B) THE RELIEF OF THE SUFFERING OF SUCH OTHER HORSES AND OTHER ANIMALS WHICH ARE SICK, INJURED OR NEGLECTED AS THE CHARITY SHALL THINK FIT (C) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES TO ENABLE DISABLED AND UNDERPRIVILEGED CHILDREN TO PARTICIPATE IN THERAPY PROGRAMMES WITH THE HORSES AND OTHER ANIMAL WHICH THE CHARITY CARES FOR WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE AND ASSISTING IN THEIR TREATMENT AND CARE. (D) THE PROVISION OF AN EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMME FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN WITH DISABILITIES AND/OR SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS AND/OR UNDERPRIVILEGED CHILDREN WHEREBY THE CHILDREN LEARN ABOUT THE ANIMALS THAT THE CHARITY CARES FOR AND LEARN ABOUT THE COUNTRYSIDE AND THE ENVIRONMENT WHICH SUSTAINS THOSE ANIMALS AND TO PROVIDE THE CHILDREN WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO EXPERIENCE AND LEARN ABOUT THE COUNTRYSIDE AND ITS CONSERVATION GENERALLY. (E)THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL PROGRAMMES FOR THE BENEFIT OF ADULTS WITH DISABILITIES AND/OR MENTAL HEALTH/EMOTIONAL OR LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AND/OR FROM A DISADVANTAGED BACKGROUND WHEREBY THEY PARTICIPATE IN PROGRAMMES WITH HORSES AND/OR WITHIN THE GREATWOOD ENVIRONMENT WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE AND ASSISTING IN IMPROVING EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES. (F) THE PROVISION OF AN EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMME FOR THE BENEFIT OF ADULTS WITH DISABILITIES AND/OR SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEED AND/OR UNDERPRIVILEGED ADULTS WHEREBY THE ADULTS LEARN ABOUT THE ANIMALS THAT THE CHARITY CARES FOR AND LEARN ABOUT THE COUNTRYSIDE AND THE ENVIRONMENT WHICH SUSTAINS THOSE ANIMALS AND TO PROVIDE THE ADULTS WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO EXPERIENCE AND LEARN ABOUT THE COUNTRYSIDE AND ITS CONSERVATION GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. MARLBOROUGH, WILTSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
RAINSCOMBE HILL FARM
CLENCH COMMON
MARLBOROUGH
SN8 4DT
- Phone:
- 01672514535
- Email:
- info@greatwoodcharity.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window