NEW LIFE CHURCH - NEWCASTLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Christian, evangelical fellowship serving the local community with strong ties abroad especially in Togo, Mozambique and Madagascar. Although our membership tends to be elderly, we are very active in local outreaches and support for worth-while causes, especially connected to spiritual and matters of well-being.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Madagascar
- Mozambique
- Togo
Governance
- 26 February 2007: Standard registration
- CHRISTIAN UNITY FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID ANTHONY CHARLES PATRICK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Eric Teye Adjetey | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
George Frederick Buchanan Grant | Trustee | 02 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES WHATLEY | Trustee | 07 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
AUDREY GRANT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.63k | £13.62k | £19.29k | £24.91k | £18.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.06k | £15.83k | £18.69k | £25.14k | £19.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/08/2006 AS AMENDED ON 14/01/2007 AS AMENDED ON 05/02/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
C H A D C A
Hanover Close SQUARE
Chapel House Estate
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE5 1EG
- Phone:
- 01830520381
- Email:
- dacpatrick@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window