CPRE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE

Charity Number: 1116687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Campaigning to protect rural England in Northamptonshire

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £33,910
Total expenditure: £22,083

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 November 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE BRANCH OF THE CAMPAIGN TO PROTECT RURAL ENGLAND (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kevin Neil Binley Trustee 17 December 2023
None on record
Graham William Ferrie Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Geoffrey Carverhill Trustee 24 January 2022
None on record
BRIAN KEVIN SKITTRALL Trustee 22 April 2010
None on record
ALAN JOHN MAYES Trustee 15 May 2008
THE CHURCH LAND
Received: On time
THE LOUISA LILLEY ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £31.28k £12.45k £11.29k £26.88k £33.91k
Total expenditure £30.33k £23.14k £4.93k £9.49k £22.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 13 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 13 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 08 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Headlands House
1 Kings Court
Kettering Parkway
Kettering
Northamptonshire
NN15 6WJ
Phone:
01604783000