HADDENHAM COMMUNITY INFANT SCHOOL VOLUNTARY FUND

Charity number: 1116513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Education of infant school age children (4-7) - curriculum enrichment

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £2,643
Total expenditure: £1,672

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 October 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HADDENHAM COUNTY FIRST SCHOOL SCHOOL FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hilary Conboy Trustee 25 January 2019
None on record
Lucy McNeil Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.98k £3.17k £2.17k £2.32k £2.64k
Total expenditure £9.80k £199 £2.02k £3.93k £1.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 05 March 2025 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 January 2025 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 November 2022 287 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WOODWAYS
HADDENHAM
BUCKS
HP17 8DS
Phone:
01844291207