OLDIES CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We take in dogs aged 7 and over and place them into foster homes until new homes can be found for them. Those that cannot be rehomed due to health/behavioural issues stay in permanent foster care and we cover their costs for life. We give lifetime back up and support to all dogs we take in. We cover all veterinary costs whilst the dogs are in foster care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
230 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOANNE TAYLOR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Zoe Allan | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|||||
MICHELLE WEBER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.01k | £84.19k | £203.87k | £134.92k | £178.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.20k | £110.40k | £174.72k | £159.50k | £143.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 FEBRUARY 2007
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF CARE AND SHELTER FOR STRAY, NEGLECTED AND UNWANTED DOGS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OLDER DOGS, AND TO ASSIST IN THE PROTECTION OF DOGS FROM ILL USAGE, CRUELTY AND SUFFERING.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
49A KINROSS CLOSE
FEARNHEAD
WARRINGTON
WA2 0UT
- Phone:
- 08445868656
- Email:
- oldies@oldies.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window