DELIVERANCE POWER INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1122204
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Afghanistan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 January 2008: Standard registration
  • 05 July 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 October 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 30 October 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 30 October 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 30 October 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2015 Not submitted