TRUE FAITH CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- undertaking church services ie, praying, singing, dancing etc - organising bible studies, serminals, sympossia for the youth and elderly; - visiting the needy in society especially those in the Ghanaian community; - occassionally undertaking field trips.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
- Ghana
Governance
- 12 January 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FRANCIS OSEI YAW | Chair |
|
|
|||||
THOMAS KOFI ACHEAMPONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAVIS AGYARKO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLLINS KOJO OPPONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ISAAC KWESI DOUGHAN DOUGHAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.22k | £8.75k | £8.97k | £9.48k | £9.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.34k | £6.25k | £7.34k | £7.11k | £6.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 JUNE 2006 AS AMENDED 23 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
(1) ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. (2) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE MENTAL, SPIRITUAL, MORAL AND PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT, EDUCATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH A FRAMEWORK OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR FULL CAPACITIES AND ENABLE THEM TO BECOME RESPONSIBLE MEMBERS OF SOCIETY SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED. (3) RELIEF OF POVERTY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE AFFECTED BY MAJOR DISASTERS AND ORPHANS IN GHANA
Area of benefit
GHANA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 3
Cumberland House
Cumberland Road
London
N9 8LY
- Phone:
- 07984949872
- Email:
- boutros2000uk@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window