CHILD RIGHTS AND YOU UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) Generating awareness about the problems faced by disadvantaged children. 2) Raising funds to support disadvantaged children from individual, corporate & by organising fund raising events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- India
Governance
- 01 May 2007: Standard registration
- CHILD RIGHTS AND YOU UK LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ram Saradchandra Kumar | Chair | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bhikhu Parekh | Trustee | 15 August 2018 |
|
|||||
Raga D'silva | Trustee | 15 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nandita Khanna | Trustee | 20 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Vivek Govil | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kreeanne Rabadi | Trustee | 22 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
PUJA MARWAHA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.12k | £126.09k | £43.12k | £116.76k | £81.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.82k | £92.40k | £14.99k | £112.27k | £142.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/11/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/01/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01/09/2011
Charitable objects
4. OBJECTS THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE, PARTICULARLY CHILDREN LIVING IN INDIA OR OF INDIAN DESCENT BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROMOTING, SPONSORING AND FACILITATING PROGRAMS, PROJECTS AND ACTIVITIES OF CRY - CHILD RIGHTS AND YOU (FORMERLY KNOWN AS CRY - CHILD RELIEF AND YOU) WHICH ARE RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE CHARITABLE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. THE CHARITY IS EMPOWERED TO ENGAGE IN ANY AND ALL LAWFUL ACTS OR ACTIVITIES WHICH ARE INCIDENTAL OR CONDUCIVE TO THE FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
INDIA.: IN PRACTICE PARTICULARLY CHILDREN LIVING IN INDIA AND OF INDIAN DESCENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Penningtons Manches LLP
125 Wood Street
London
- Phone:
- 02074573002
- Email:
- cry.uk@crymail.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window