FARINGDON AND DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing education and social welfare of the public, particularly of retired people by means of monthly meetings, special interest groups and visits.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Oxfordshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 07 October 2006: Standard registration
- Faringdon and District U3A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Hoole | Chair | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Curtis | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Langham | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Jones | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tessa Timms | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Cain | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Wilkins | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Peter Robinson | Trustee | 14 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHELA ROWAN | Trustee | 09 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ricky Cunningham | Trustee | 09 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER FOOT | Trustee | 10 April 2014 |
|
|||||
Rita Higazi | Trustee | 09 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.09k | £7.83k | £8.68k | £7.40k | £8.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.61k | £7.29k | £5.66k | £11.93k | £10.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 APRIL 2006 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
FARINGDON AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27A High Street
Watchfield
SWINDON
SN6 8SZ
- Phone:
- 01367615385
- Email:
- chairman@faringdonu3a.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window