MEN'S AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provide help and advice
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 October 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Charles Corcoran | Chair | 07 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Les Culshaw | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Steven Duncan Allan | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.73k | £2.00k | £1.50k | £750 | £1.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.25k | £2.75k | £2.25k | £500 | £613 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
1 TO RELIEVE THE HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING OF MALE VICTIMS (AND THEIR FAMILIES) OF DOMESTIC ABUSE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY SHALL DECIDE FROM TIME TO TIME. 2 THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF MEN'S HEALTH (BOTH PHYSICAL AND MENTAL) IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT AND LAWFUL. 3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS RELATING TO DOMESTIC ABUSE IN ORDER TO RAISE AWARENESS OF THE NEEDS OF ABUSE VICTIMS AND TO UNDERTAKE WHENEVER NECESSARY THE PREVENTION OF DISCRIMINATION AGAINST MALES ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX SO FAR AS SUCH DISCRIMINATION IS UNLAWFUL.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Men's Aid Charity
c/o 15 Leeson House
St Mary's Court
Peterborough
PE1 1UT
- Phone:
- 03335670556
- Email:
- help@mensaid.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window