Accounts and annual returns IREBY PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1116401
Charity reporting is overdue by 4 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 25 July 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 4 days
Accounts and TAR 25 July 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 4 days
Annual return 25 July 2023 27 May 2024 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 25 July 2022 20 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 25 July 2021 20 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 25 July 2020 14 September 2021 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 July 2020 Not Required