POSITIVE STROKES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity looks after stroke patients and their carers. When people come out of hospital after stroke once their needs have been assessed by social services and provided with all necessary equipment they are left entirely on their own. This means that because of their disabilities they are mainly confined to their home. We endeavour to bring them back socially into the real world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Middlesbrough
- Redcar And Cleveland
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 22 December 2006: Standard registration
- 09 July 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- 08 July 2019: Re-registered
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEFF THOMAS | Chair | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA SIMPSON | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET JEFFERSON | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.12k | £739 | £2.68k | £1.82k | £2.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £914 | £1.15k | £3.73k | £1.81k | £2.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 DECEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE SUFFERED FROM STROKES AND THEIR FAMILY AND CARERS.
Area of benefit
MIDDLESBROUGH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 BEVERLEY ROAD
REDCAR
TS10 3RQ
- Phone:
- 0774 6734634
- Email:
- jeffthomas@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window