Financial history TIBER COMMUNITY BUILDING

Charity Number: 1125710
Charity reporting is up to date (81 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £115.49k £77.75k £13.51k £139.71k £381.81k
Total expenditure £92.03k £56.45k £84.43k £52.72k £181.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £31.38k £10.00k £6.00k £71.66k £341.94k