THE KEN STRADLING COLLECTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
It is a growing collection providing opportunities for education and inspiration to all those interested in good design, and craftsmanship. It has close links with art and design students in Bristol, Bath and beyond.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 25 January 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Dunscombe | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Jodie Inkson | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jo Elsworth | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Hallworth | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Lanyon | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen White | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|||||
David Beech | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £221.09k | £29.53k | £33.48k | £22.72k | £46.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.93k | £96.46k | £44.76k | £45.25k | £50.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.72k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 SEPTEMBER 2006 as amended on 26 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ART, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE EXHIBITION OF CERAMICS, DECORATIVE ARTS AND DESIGN OF THE TWENTIETH CENTURY AND TO PRESERVE THE SAME AS A COLLECTION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE BRISTOL AND GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 PARK ROW
Bristol
BS1 5LH
- Phone:
- 01173290566
- Email:
- info@stradlingcollection.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window