Trustees THE IPSWICH HOSPITAL BAND LIMITED
Charity number: 1116233

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew John Mayhew | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Robert Arthur Goodridge | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Claire Mayhew | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Corinne Danielle Rousham | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosalyn Ann Burrow | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
MRS KATE BUDGEN | Trustee | 02 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
SARAH JEAN PURBROOK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS MAGGIE PORTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOY WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.