THE SHILDON CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of facilities for recreation or other leisure in the interests of social welfare. Currently inactive.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
Governance
- 19 January 2007: Standard registration
- 04 December 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | 24 November 2009 | 147 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 AUGUST 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 12 DECEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE. THE RELIEF OF ANY CHARITABLE NEED, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, FINANCIAL NEED, SICKNESS AND UNEMPLOYMENT BY THE PROVISION OF A COUNSELLING AND INFORMATION SERVICE; AND THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES BY CHARITABLE AND NON-CHARITABLE BODIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, COUNTY DURHAM.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window