THE AIA EDUCATIONAL AND BENEVOLENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of public education in accountancy and related commercial subjects. Relief in cases of need, hardship or distress of Fellows, Associates or registered Students of AIA and their wives, children and other dependents through grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Austria
- Bahrain
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belgium
- Bulgaria
- Burma
- Cambodia
- Canada
- China
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Dominica
- Egypt
- Falkland Islands
- Fiji
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Ghana
- Gibraltar
- Greece
- Greenland
- Grenada
- Guernsey
- Hong Kong
- Hungary
- Iceland
- India
- Indonesia
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Israel
- Italy
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Jersey
- Kenya
- Kuwait
- Latvia
- Liechtenstein
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Macau
- Macedonia
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Maldives
- Mali
- Malta
- Mauritius
- Moldova
- Monaco
- Mongolia
- Montenegro
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Pakistan
- Papua New Guinea
- Philippines
- Poland
- Portugal
- Qatar
- Réunion
- Romania
- Russia
- Saint Helena
- Saint Pierre And Miquelon
- Saint Vincent
- Samoa
- San Marino
- Saudi Arabia
- Scotland
- Serbia
- Seychelles
- Singapore
- Sint Maarten
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- South Africa
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- St Kitts And Nevis
- St Lucia
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Taiwan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Bahamas
- The Gambia
- Tonga
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Ukraine
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- Uzbekistan
- Vietnam
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 27 September 2024: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Twaraq Oozeerally FAIA | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Martin Ford | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shahram Moallemi | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leslie David Bradley FAIA | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW RICHARD LAMB FAIA | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.04k | £2.00k | £1.11k | £1.76k | £2.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.48k | £11.84k | £5.48k | £2.98k | £10.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 FEBRUARY 2007 as amended on 29 May 2024
Charitable objects
4.1.1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ACCOUNTANCY AND RELATED COMMERCIAL SUBJECTS AND THE PRACTICE THEREOF INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION AND TO THE EXTENT A CHARITABLE PURPOSE): A) THE GIVING OF PRIZES, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES, REWARDS OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO PERSONS UNDERGOING EDUCATION OR TRAINING; B) THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING BY MEANS OF PROVISION OF ENDOWMENTS, PRIZES, BURSARIES, SCHOLARSHIPS, GRANTS, GIFTS OR OTHERWISE; 4.1.2) THE RELIEF IN CASES OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF PERSONS WHO ARE FELLOWS, MEMBERS OR REGISTERED STUDENTS OF THE ASSOCIATION AND THEIR WIVES, WIDOWS, CHILDREN AND OTHER DEPENDENTS OF SUCH PERSONS BEING IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE BY MAKING GRANTS AND IN SUCH OTHER WAY AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Linked charities
- 27 September 2024 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Association of International
Accountants
Unit 3
Staithes
The Watermark
NE11 9SN
- Phone:
- 01914930261
- Email:
- trust.fund@aiaworldwide.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window