HEALTH BEHAVIOUR GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our primary concern is promoting sexual health among young people by encouraging more rewarding relationships. Resources and programmes designed by the Health Behaviour Group are used mainly in educational settings but have been adapted to a variety of contexts. We specialise in peer-led and multi-agency approaches with participatory, group-learning styles often involving dramatic conventions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Malawi
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 October 2006: Standard registration
- APAUSE (Working name)
- HBG (Working name)
- SRE PROJECT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR JOHN TRIPP | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MATT MACAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TONY PAINE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ROBIN JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.26k | £37.51k | £74.75k | £66.00k | £25.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.71k | £41.20k | £72.66k | £42.60k | £41.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 12 October 2022 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 12 October 2022 | 134 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 29 September 2021 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 29 September 2021 | 121 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 02 June 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 JUNE 2006.
Charitable objects
(3.) THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH BY: (3.1) THE DEVELOPMENT , PROVISION AND EVALUATION OF INTERVENTIONS TO ASSIST THE PUBLIC, AND IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE DEVELOPMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF BEHAVIOURS, THAT WILL ENHANCE THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH; (3.2) RESEARCH INTO THE EFFECTIVENESS OF EDUCATION ABOUT HEALTH UPON THE BEHAVIOUR OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR UPON CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; AND (3.3) THE PROVISION OF ADVICE UPON ALL ASPECTS OF HEALTH BEHAVIOUR.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1
Western Villas
Western Road
Crediton
Devon
- Phone:
- 01392823004
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window