KIRKLEES ADVENTURE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our main aim is to provide and support adventurous activities locally, notably but not exclusively the Duke of Edinburgh's Award through voluntary effort, grant provision and fundraising. We believe that financial constraints and additional needs should not be a barrier to participation in these activities, which help to develop the confidence, motivation and skills needed in everyday life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Kirklees
Governance
- 05 March 2007: Standard registration
- KIRKLEES DUKE OF EDINBURGH'S AWARD TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW JAMES SAWARD | Chair | 14 September 2021 |
|
|||||
TAYA HARRISON | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
JILL ANDREWS | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonjo George Horne | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
AYEESHA JAVID | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Salha Falaoui | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr SALLY CATHERINE SALTER | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN MICHAEL DUNN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.39k | £58.69k | £14.18k | £23.90k | £46.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.28k | £31.39k | £75.59k | £18.63k | £71.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22 JANUARY 2007 AS AMENDED ON 14 JAN 2020 AS AMENDED ON 26 MAY 2020 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 25 JUL 2020
Charitable objects
To deliver public benefit by the provision of education, training and recreational facilities for young people and vulnerable or isolated adults in the Kirklees area in particular (but not exclusively) those hard to reach or with special needs so as to develop their physical, mental and spiritual capacities that they may grow as individuals and members of society and that their conditions of life may be improved by promoting and participating in adventurous, volunteering and skilled activities.
Area of benefit
KIRKLEES AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Little Deer Wood Outdoor Centre
Shepley Bridge Marina
Huddersfield Road
MIRFIELD
WF14 9HR
- Phone:
- 01484225952
- Website:
-
kirkleesadventuretrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window