OVERSEAS PLASTIC SURGERY APPEAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide life-enhancing reconstructive surgery to babies and children from impoverished families in the third world who have cleft lip and palate conditions, and other disfiguring deformities, and who have no other recourse to such treatment. Provide on-site training to other local professionals and ancillary staff. Procure and provide surgical and aneasthetic equipment for use in the 3rd world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Pakistan
Governance
- 31 October 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shahban Meherban | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Wilkinson | Trustee | 02 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Brown | Trustee | 06 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ariel Bruce | Trustee | 06 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR MUHAMMED RIAZ FRCS | Trustee |
|
||||||
RAE JENNIFER MCGLONE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNETTE MIDDLETON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.07k | £102.40k | £84.17k | £31.25k | £76.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.91k | £37.07k | £152.09k | £20.70k | £42.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AMONGST PERSONS IN SUCH NEED, IN THIRD WORLD COUNTRIES BY THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL TEAMS AND EQUIPMENT, TO CARRY OUT LIFE-ENHANCING RE-CONSTRUCTIVE SURGERY, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR CHILDREN REQUIRING CLEFT LIP AND PALATE SURGERY IN ASIA. 2. TO ADVANCE THE TEACHING AND TRAINING OF LOCAL HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONALS, IN THE FIELDS OF SURGERY, ANAESTHESIA AND PERI-OPERATIVE PRACTICE IN GENERAL. 3. FOR THE ACQUISITION OF BASIC GENERAL MEDICAL, SURGICAL AND ANAESTHETIC EQUIPMENT NECESSARY FOR THE ABOVE FUNCTIONS.
Area of benefit
ASIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Overseas Plastic Surgery Appeal
c/o NLG Health Ltd
Riverside House
3 Earls Court
Henry Boot Way
HULL
- Phone:
- 01482841228
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window