YESHIVAS AHAVAS TORAH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
By providing a wide range of support, services, courses, and engaging activities, we empower teenagers who are facing challenges and at-risk teens. We aim to create a solid foundation for a promising and fulfilling future through these initiatives. Our focus is on equipping them with the necessary tools, resources, and opportunities to thrive and succeed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 20 December 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yisroel Yaakov Fischer | Chair | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Simche Steinberger | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ariel Truman | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gershon Klein | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yaakov Wolf Nowogrodski | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.73k | £91.04k | £224.27k | £431.56k | £358.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.98k | £96.91k | £220.75k | £433.07k | £267.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 August 2023 | 197 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 August 2023 | 197 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
3.1) THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE TO ADVANCE THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION AND ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGIOUS EDUCATION GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY CARRYING ON MANAGING AND MAINTAINING THE COLLEGE. 3.2) THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH OF THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE INCLUDING PAYMENTS BY WAY OF GIFT OR LOAN (WITH OR WITHOUT INTEREST) TO INDIVIDUAL PERSONS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD PROVIDED THAT SUCH PERSONS QUALIFY AS OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES OF THE COLLEGE AS DETERMINED BY ENGLISH LAW..
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE HARINGEY AND HACKNEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 Fairview Road
LONDON
N15 6LJ
- Phone:
- 020 3411 7789
- Email:
- contact@yeshiva.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window