HAZRAT KHADIJA-TUL-KUBRA GIRLS SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational facilities for children and adults with special provisions for women and girls.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 08 August 2007: Standard registration
- HKKGS (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Muhammad Gous | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Abdul Hussain | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Ghaus Miah | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
Hafiz Moulana Md Abdur Rob | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
MR Mohammed Nurul HOQUE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
SYED JUBAYER AHMED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
ALAIS MIAH EKHLASUR RAHMAN | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
HABIB ULLAH | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
MR SHAMSU MIAH | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £315.00k | £356.64k | £346.49k | £372.61k | £426.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £293.86k | £311.51k | £366.58k | £359.40k | £408.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £98.15k | £19.70k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED AT A MEETING DATED 28 FEBRUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
THE MAIN OBJECT OF THE TRUST IS TO:- A. ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MUSLIM GIRLS LIVING IN OR AROUND BIRMINGHAM BY PROVIDING A SCHOOL IN WHICH THE VARIOUS LANGUAGES, THEOLOGIES, JURISPRUDENCE AND THEORIES CONNECTED TO THE ISLAMIC ETHOS ARE TAUGHT IN ADDITION TO THE NATIONAL CURRICULUM. B. PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING, COMMUNICATION AND PRACTICE OF ISLAM AND ITS LEGAL AND SPIRITUAL ETHOS. C. PROVIDE RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY IN BIRMINGHAM WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
IN OR AROUND BIRMINGHAM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Dixon Road
Birmingham
B10 0BP
- Phone:
- 01217737496
- Email:
- admin@hkkg.bham.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window