ROSSENDALE RAYS SPECIAL NEEDS SPORTS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rossendale Rays' Charitable Objects are to provide water-based sports, cycling and access to other sports for members with Special Educational Needs and Disabilities, in order to benefit their health & well being. Our inclusive weekly sessions attract an average of 100 SEND members including parents, family members and carers from Rossendale, Lancashire and the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £4,977 from 1 government contract(s) and £250 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 19 March 2007: Standard registration
- ROSSENDALE RAYS (Working name)
- ROSSENDALE RAYS MULTI-ABILITY SWIMMING CLUB (Previous name)
- ROSSENDALE RAYS SPECIAL NEEDS CLUB (Previous name)
- ROSSENDALE RAYS SPECIAL NEEDS SWIMMING CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Harry Collier | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony David Pooler | Trustee | 28 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Heather Jean Walker | Trustee | 12 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mary Clare Mulderrig | Trustee | 06 November 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.84k | £28.50k | £75.34k | £45.73k | £28.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.43k | £26.06k | £70.85k | £29.84k | £39.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £21.50k | £27.80k | N/A | £4.98k | |
|
Income from government grants | £55 | £500 | N/A | £2.24k | £250 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25/07/2006 AS AMENDED ON 14/11/2006 AS AMENDED ON 11/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19 JUN 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE WATER BASED SPORTS OPPORTUNITIES, CYCLING ACTIVITIES AND TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE TO ACCESS OTHER SPORTS ACTIVITIES, FOR DISABLED PEOPLE FROM ROSSENDALE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING.
Area of benefit
ROSSENDALE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROSSENDALERAYS SPECIAL NEED SPORTS
72 Bank Street
Rawtenstall
ROSSENDALE
LANCASHIRE
BB4 8EG
- Phone:
- 01706222852
- Email:
- clare@mulderrigs.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window