Financial history CALVARY CHARISMATIC BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1116360
Charity reporting is up to date (88 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £724.17k £764.99k £846.45k £987.58k £963.36k
Total expenditure £559.66k £513.30k £842.08k £835.24k £817.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £31.52k £11.20k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £29.68k £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £704.53k £486.83k £719.06k £923.08k £750.19k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £345
Income - Other £19.64k £278.16k £97.71k £64.50k £212.82k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £547.70k £292.73k £842.08k £835.24k £817.62k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £280.65k £308.39k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £11.96k £220.58k £0 £0 £0