Trustees THE RATCLIFFE CHORALE

Charity Number: 1118020
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kathy Bacon Trustee 28 April 2025
None on record
Sheila Langley Trustee 28 April 2025
None on record
Michael Newton Trustee 28 April 2025
None on record
Richard Power Trustee 28 April 2025
None on record
Martin Broomhead Trustee 20 September 2023
None on record
Angela Whitton Trustee 19 September 2020
None on record
Catherine Way Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
SUSAN ROBERTS Trustee 23 February 2012
None on record