HAPPY CHILD INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objective is 'A child and family services charity organisation delivering child care services for the rescue of street children and children at risk from multiple threats. We advocate for their rights and work in partnership with governments and other care agencies in areas of the world, with the current focus being Brazil. We do this work with a Christian conviction
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
- Brazil
Governance
- 15 November 2006: Standard registration
- 14 May 2013: Funds received from 1042236 HAPPY CHILD
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joao Martinez da Cruz | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Dodrell | Trustee | 19 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Clive Teuten | Trustee | 09 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HERRING | Trustee | 21 October 2011 |
|
|||||
MARK ANDREW PINKS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.10k | £102.76k | £98.27k | £67.15k | £113.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.15k | £96.77k | £74.69k | £46.84k | £71.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 March 2024 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 March 2024 | 126 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 SEPTEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY ALL EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD. 2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY - TO BE ADVANCED IN VARIOUS WAYS INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: A PROVIDING HELP, CARE AND ASSISTANCE FOR STREET CHILDREN, HOMELESS CHILDREN, ORPHANS, AND CHILDREN IN NEED THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND ESPECIALLY IN LATIN AMERICA. B PROVIDING ALL NECESSARY SUPPORT AND FINANCIAL SUPPORT AND HELP TO THOSE WORKING WITH AND HELPING STREET CHILDREN, HOMELESS CHILDREN, ORPHANS AND CHILDREN IN NEED. 3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGHOUT THE WORLD - TO BE ADVANCED IN VARIOUS WAYS INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: A PROVIDING EDUCATION AND PRIMARY HEALTH CARE TO STREET CHILDREN, HOMELESS CHILDREN, ORPHANS AND CHILDREN IN NEED, AND SIMILAR PERSONS IN NEED OF IT. B UNDERTAKING ASSISTING OR FINANCING RESEARCH INTO THE PROBLEMS OF STREET CHILDREN, HOMELESS CHILDREN, ORPHANS AND THOSE LIVING IN POVERTY OR NEED, AND HOW APPROPRIATE HELP CAN BE PROVIDED OR IMPROVED. C PROVIDING EDUCATION TO THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE PROBLEMS OF STREET CHILDREN, HOMELESS CHILDREN, ORPHANS AND THOSE LIVING IN POVERTY OR NEED. D SEEKING TO RESTRICT THE GROWTH AND INCREASE IN PROBLEMS ASSOCIATED WITH STREET CHILDREN, HOMELESS CHILDREN, ORPHANS AND SIMILAR PERSONS IN NEED BY EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER APPROPRIATE MEANS AND BY ENCOURAGING CARING AND STABLE FAMILY LIFE AND RELATIONSHIPS. 4 TO CARRY OUT ANY OTHER OBJECTS WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AND ARE BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN THE PLACES WHERE THE CHARITY IS PROVIDING HELP, CARE AND ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND ESPECIALLY IN LATIN AMERICA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Happy Child International
Leatherhead Institute
67 High Street
Leatherhead
KT22 8AH
- Phone:
- 01372375848
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window