CONNECT-NORTH PETHERTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Connect North Petherton facilitates local projects Cafe Connect: monthly drop-in cafe held at Community Centre with varying activities & speakers. Social hub Info & signposting service Drop-in point for local community police officer, village agent. Links with local organisations: library, primary school, local college,medical practice & it's PPGroup. Inter-generational. All welcome.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Somerset
Governance
- 14 December 2006: Standard registration
- CNP (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HEATHER ELIZABETH WHITTLE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Alexia Joy English | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
JENNY DAVIS | Trustee | 23 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MOLLIE ELIZABETH FOOKS-BALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET MAUREEN COLLINGWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.94k | £0 | £0 | £4.50k | £4.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.70k | £240 | £264 | £4.05k | £5.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 February 2025 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 MARCH 2005 AS AMENDED 14 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE HEALTH FOR THE RESIDENTS OF THE PARISH OF NORTH PETHERTON IN SOMERSET, BY PROVIDING, OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT. 2. TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED IN THE PARISH OF NORTH PETHERTON, SUCH AS THE ELDERLY AND THE SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED, BY RUNNING ACTIVITIES THAT WILL MEET THEIR NEEDS AND HELP PROMOTE THEIR ACTIVE PARTICIPATION IN SOCIETY. 3. TO PROMOTE ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF NORTH PETHERTON, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, ABILITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING WITH THE LOCAL INHABITANTS, LOCAL AUTHORITY AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. 4. TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
NORTH PETHERTON, SOMERSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Orchard Close
North Petherton
Bridgwater
TA6 6TW
- Phone:
- 01278663820
- Email:
- janetmcollingwood@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window