FRIENDS OF SEVAI SOCIETY UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides funding and finance generally to Sevai Society in Madurai district India and promote its activities and to promote this organisation by providing information to interested donors and potential volunteers elsewhere in the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 July 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- East Sussex
- Essex
- Kent
- Surrey
- West Sussex
- Throughout London
- India
Governance
- 23 November 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GLORIA MARY ST ROMAINE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUZANNE MARY WRIGHTMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FRANK BRADBURY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRENDA WRIGHTMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2017 | 30/07/2018 | 30/07/2019 | 30/07/2020 | 30/07/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.15k | £2.13k | £885 | £660 | £645 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.00k | £3.04k | £2.50k | £0 | £2.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 341 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 341 days | |
Annual return | 30 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 707 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 707 days | |
Annual return | 30 July 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 July 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 July 2019 | 23 March 2021 | 297 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 AUGUST 2005 AS AMENDED 28 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN MADURAI IN THE REPUBLIC OF INDIA, INCLUDING THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT, PROTECTION OF HEALTH, PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND RELIEF OF NEED BY SUCH MEANS AS DETERMINED BY THE CHARITY INCLUDING BY FINANCIALLY SUPPORTING PROJECTS AND ACTIVITIES UNDERTAKEN BY THE SEVAI SOCIETY IN INDIA.
Area of benefit
MADURAI, INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 14
Cheriton Court
Selhurst Road
London
SE25 6LW
- Phone:
- 02086538642
- Email:
- brad185@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window