Financial history HOME-START COLCHESTER, JAYWICK & CLACTON

Charity number: 1116639
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £160.32k £197.65k £248.75k £231.68k £218.52k
Total expenditure £173.55k £174.78k £234.85k £213.18k £182.70k
Income from government contracts N/A £14.14k £91.51k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £18.00k N/A N/A N/A £31.00k