SKT NIKOLAJ DANISH SEAMEN'S CHURCH IN HULL

Charity Number: 1120852
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Preach the Christian Gospel, hold Divine services and conduct Church rites and ceremonies in Danish. Facilitate the visiting of ships carrying Scandinavian personel. Promote knowledge of and act as a focal point for Scandinavian community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £1,121
Total expenditure: £15,090

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Kingston Upon Hull City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 September 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Aarosin Chair 02 March 2019
SKT. NICKOLAJ DANISH CHURCH CIO
Received: On time
Susanne Veien Bolwig Gilbert Trustee 07 April 2019
TRUST PROPERTY DANISH LUTHERAN CHURCH OF ST NICOLAI
Received: On time
graham Gilbert Trustee 07 April 2019
POCKLINGTON AND DISTRICT SOCIETY OF THE ARTS
Received: On time
TRUST PROPERTY DANISH LUTHERAN CHURCH OF ST NICOLAI
Received: On time
SKT. NICKOLAJ DANISH CHURCH CIO
Received: On time
Paul Towle Trustee 07 April 2019
SKT. NICKOLAJ DANISH CHURCH CIO
Received: On time
Anette Gould Trustee 12 March 2017
SKT. NICKOLAJ DANISH CHURCH CIO
Received: On time
MERETHE WALGATE Trustee 12 March 2017
None on record
Dorthe Hostick Trustee 13 March 2016
SKT. NICKOLAJ DANISH CHURCH CIO
Received: On time
HANNE HAMILTON Trustee
SKT. NICKOLAJ DANISH CHURCH CIO
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £44.58k £30.41k £33.58k £6.60k £1.12k
Total expenditure £53.15k £24.78k £44.33k £6.50k £15.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 14 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 09 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 November 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 November 2020 2 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 St. Johns Close
Pocklington
YORK
YO42 2XD
Phone:
07850032480
Email:
hull@dsuk.dk