FOUNTAIN OF LOVE MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HOLDING REGULAR WORSHIP SERVICES THAT ARE FREE AND OPEN TO TH PUBLIC TO RAISE AN AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF SPIRITUAL ENRICHMENT THROUGH PRACTICING THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 July 2008: Standard registration
- 05 July 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.79k | £27.34k | £19.16k | £9.85k | £9.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.32k | £26.64k | £17.81k | £9.66k | £8.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 3 JUNE 2007
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH [IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS] IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; 2 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNTIED KINGDOM RO THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; AND 3 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITE KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window