Accounts and annual returns NPPG LIMITED

Charity number: 1117648
Charity reporting is up to date (96 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 February 2025 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 04 February 2025 96 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 06 August 2024 280 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 06 August 2024 280 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window