EMMANUEL CELEBRATION CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HOLDING REGULAR SERVICES TO PROMOTE THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF SPIRITUAL ENLIGHTENMENT THROUGH PRACTICING THE CORE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £5,048 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 November 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANE KIGURU | Trustee | 30 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Kaniaru | Trustee | 17 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev PETER KAMAU | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £174.38k | £239.18k | £308.11k | £398.90k | £344.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £178.89k | £220.73k | £301.15k | £394.04k | £355.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £67.72k | N/A | £5.05k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 April 2023
(These accounts |
28 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 09 March 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 09 March 2023 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3 AUGUST 2006
Charitable objects
3.2 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: 3.2.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH {IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS} IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; 3.2.2 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; AND 3.2.3 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT. 3.3 THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHURCH IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 FAIREY AVENUE
HAYES
UB3 4NY
- Phone:
- 07540787281
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window