THE LACROSSE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote community participation in lacrosse. To assist providing facilities for lacrosse. To advance the education of young people in the sport of lacrosse.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 January 2007: Standard registration
- SOUTH OF ENGLAND LACROSSE EDUCATIONAL TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT COLLINGE | Chair | 01 July 2006 |
|
|
||||
Ally McDonald Alonso | Trustee | 19 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Laptain | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice Innes | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel David Murphy | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Geoffrey Mark Jessup | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Heather Fiona Carroll | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ADAM FOOTITT | Trustee | 16 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
AMIT BISWAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.09k | £19.11k | £21.34k | £65.03k | £36.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.09k | £19.74k | £51.17k | £171.29k | £139.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 JULY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 6 DECEMBER 2006 AND 13 MARCH 2008 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 03 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTH RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PARTICIPATING IN LACROSSE AND OTHER SPORTS THAT CONSTITUTE HEALTHY RECREATION ("FACILITIES" MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING EVENTS); (2) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCE OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE; AND (4) TO ADVANCE ANY OTHER PURPOSE THAT IS CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN ASSOCIATION WITH SPORT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE GREAT BRITAIN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 12
Walsingham
St. Johns Wood Park
London
NW8 6RG
- Phone:
- 07976937990
- Website:
-
thelacrossefoundation.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window