REBOUNDERS SPECIAL NEEDS TRAMPOLINE CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rebounders helps improve mobility, balance and strength in individuals with additional or profound needs through trampolining and tramp-ability. Classes are run by qualified and experienced coaches. Clients attend in small groups or individually, as their needs dictate. Wheelchair clients are welcome and a hoist is available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Cardiff
Governance
- 26 January 2007: Standard registration
- 12 March 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 12 March 2019: Funds transferred to 1175711 TWISTERS SOUTH WALES REBOUND TRAMPOLINE CLUB
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.88k | £112.17k | £129.20k | £153.12k | £113.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.69k | £109.29k | £123.96k | £142.20k | £105.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 19 February 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 19 February 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 21 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | 21 December 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 03 April 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | 03 April 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 01 March 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | 01 March 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 DECEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED ON 23 APR 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN WITH PHYSICAL, PSYCHOLOGICAL, LEARNING OR SPEECH DIFFICULTIES BY PROVIDING THEM WITH THE OPPORTUNITY OF PARTICIPATING IN THE ACTIVITY OF TRAMPOLINING
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE CARDIFF
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window