ANGELS SUPPORT GROUP HITCHIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide support and guidance to parents/carers/siblings of children who are diagnosed with (or being assessed for) Attention Deficit Hyperactivity Disorder (ADHD) and/or Autistic Spectrum Disorder (ASD) and their associated conditions. To provide or assist in the provision of facilities for these families in the interest of social welfare and for recreation and other leisure time occupation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £1,530 from 1 government contract(s) and £1,300 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 29 November 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Clare Louise Slater | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Andrew Kyle Webster | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Phillip Carlton Temperley | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suresh Wasant Banarse | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Osment | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tammy Smith | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Lynne Ager | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rowena Jane Crabtree | Trustee | 13 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Janet Forrester | Trustee | 28 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Olukemi Adejare | Trustee | 29 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.61k | £89.20k | £120.97k | £105.44k | £96.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.59k | £81.29k | £84.08k | £91.84k | £106.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £2.72k | £3.11k | £1.53k | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.50k | N/A | N/A | £4.15k | £1.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 JANUARY 2005 AS AMENDED 8 NOVEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED ON 29 SEP 2015
Charitable objects
1 TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PARENTS, CARERS AND SIBLINGS OF CHILDREN WHO ARE DIAGNOSED AS SUFFERING FROM ATTENTION DEFICIT HYPERACTIVITY DISORDER (ADHD) AND/OR AUTISTIC SPECTRUM DISORDER (ASD) AND THEIR ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS OR ARE BEING ASSESSED FOR THESE CONDITIONS BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND GUIDANCE. 2 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION, EDUCATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE PARENTS, CARERS AND SIBLINGS DESCRIBED ABOVE, INASMUCH AS THEY ARE IN NEED OF THESE SERVICES AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED. 3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND STATUTORY BODIES IN MATTERS RELATED TO ADHD AND ASD. 4 TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS DETERMINED BY THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, STEVENAGE, HERTFORDSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Angels Support Group Hitchin
Unit 19
Pixmore Business Centre
Pixmore Avenue
Letchworth Garden City
HERTS
- Phone:
- 01462685150
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window