Financial history GOLDEN BUDDHA HOUSING

Charity Number: 1117987
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2009 31/05/2010 31/05/2011 31/05/2012 31/05/2013
Total gross income £201 £12 £9 £9 £8
Total expenditure £76 £78 £105 £100 £125
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A