CATALYST URBAN TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The transformation of deprived communities through C.O.A.C.H. (Creating Opportunities And Casting Hope). C.O.A.C.H. is a four-fold strategy for community transformation: C.O.A.C.H. - Community Mentoring C.O.A.C.H. - Community Leadership C.O.A.C.H. - Urban Toolkit C.O.A.C.H. - Community Resources Our aim: a well evaluated model that has Local Impact and National Significance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 14 December 2006: Standard registration
- 25 July 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CATALYST TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £163.56k | £163.56k | £175.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £165.14k | £165.14k | £221.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 20 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | 30 September 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 13 November 2009 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 09 October 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 2 JUNE 2006 AS AMENDED 7 SEPTEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE INCLUDING (BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) BY MEANS OF DEVELOPING THE CAPACITIES AND SKILLS OF MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND (B) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND (C) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (D) TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE THROUGH CONCILIATION FOR FAMILIES AND/OR MEMBERS OF DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES WHOSE RELATIONSHIPS APPEAR TO BE BREAKING DOWN AND, WHERE SUCH RELATIONSHIPS HAVE ALREADY BROKEN DOWN, TO ADVISE AND HELP IN THE SETTLEMENT OF DIFFERENCES; AND (E) TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window