THE WESTSIDE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Westside is a model of how a small school for young people in Key Stage 4 who are at risk of failing in mainstream education can get them 'back on track' through a GCSE based curriculum with emphasis on individual attention, and building self confidence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 07 November 2006: Standard registration
- 05 July 2013: Removed (Exempt charity)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2008 | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £181.22k | £234.24k | £314.27k | £350.18k | £432.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.39k | £245.95k | £278.98k | £346.58k | £429.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 18 May 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | 13 February 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 12 May 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | 13 February 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 29 March 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | 02 March 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 26 July 2010 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | 12 May 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/07/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/06/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING, CARRYING ON, MANAGING AND DEVELOPING AN EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTION WHICH IS PRINCIPALLY CONCERNED WITH PROVIDING FULL-TIME OR PART-TIME EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN OF COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE WHO, BY REASON OF ILLNESS, EXCLUSION FROM SCHOOL OR OTHERWISE, MAY NOT FOR ANY PERIOD RECEIVE SUITABLE EDUCATION UNLESS ALTERNATIVE PROVISION IS MADE FOR THEM ("THE ALTERNATIVE PROVISION ACADEMY").
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE GREATER LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window