ROOTED IN CHRIST MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable activities: Preaching of the gospel, Prison evangelism, oragnising seminars/workshops on the alternatives to violence, youth empowerment programmes, counselling, drop-in-services, community outreach projects like, rehabilitation of offenders rendering help to the homeless, feeding them and supplying educational materials to children from less privileged families in Africa, etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Southwark
- Nigeria
Governance
- 23 February 2007: Standard registration
- 05 July 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 08 November 2019: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR RUDY ALCOS MAQUILAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PASTOR JOHN NWADINOBI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PASTOR MRS RACHEL NWADINOBI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev ERIC EMOKPAE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.38k | £5.88k | £4.85k | £4.75k | £4.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.30k | £4.68k | £3.88k | £4.60k | £4.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 08 February 2025 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 30 May 2024 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 15 March 2023 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 04 April 2022 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 JANUARY 2007
Charitable objects
- TO ADVANCE CHRISTIANITY IN ACCORDANCE WITH ARTICLES OF FAITH SET OUT IN ANNEX A" [WHERE ANNEX A" ATTACHED TO THE GOVERNING DOCUMENT SETS THESE OUT]: - TO ADVANCE CHRISTIANITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH [THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF APPEARING IN ANNEX A"] - THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIANITY MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MEANS OF BROADCASTING [CHRISTIANITY] MESSAGES OF AN EVANGELISTIC AND TEACHING NATURE. - TO ADVANCE CHRISTIANITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYING MEETINGS, LECTURES, SEMINARS, WORKSHOPS, CONFERENCES [PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS] PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON [CHRISTIANITY] TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE EUROPE, ASIA, AFRICA,USA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Denmark Hill Community Hall
Blanchedowne
Camberwell
LONDON
SE5 8HL
- Phone:
- 08081685755
- Email:
- rootedinchrist@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window