SEA SANCTUARY- THE VESSEL FOR CHANGE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
"Sea Sanctuary http://www.seasanctuary.org.uk. uses the setting of the sea to promote and develop sustainable positive mental health and well being. We provide a variety of therapeutic programmes based on-shore and on the water aimed at reducing stress and anxiety; developing self reliance, social integration and employability, in order to enhance and sustain long term positive sense of worth."
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 28 November 2006: Standard registration
- 30 September 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 30 September 2019: Funds transferred to 1172246 ARC Healthcare Southwest
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2013 | 30/11/2014 | 30/11/2015 | 30/11/2016 | 30/11/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £239.20k | £436.31k | £328.07k | £285.21k | £158.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £181.50k | £328.42k | £290.19k | £288.12k | £392.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2017 | 04 October 2018 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2017 | 04 October 2018 | 4 days late | |
Annual return | 30 November 2016 | 08 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2016 | 08 September 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 November 2015 | 28 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2015 | 28 September 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE TO PROMOTE, IN SOUTH CORNWALL, THE PRESERVATION OF MENTAL HEALTH REQUIRING ADVICE OR TREATMENT AND TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING AND REHABILITATING PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL DISORDER OR CONDITIONS OF EMOTIONAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS, WHETHER ARISING FROM THE EFFECTS OF THE LONG TERM USE OF TRANQUILIZERS, ANTIDEPRESSANTS AND SIMILAR DRUGS, OR OTHERWISE. IN ADDITION, THE TRUST WILL AIM TO PROMOTE AND DELIVER COMPREHENSIVE RELEVANT TRAINING AND EDUCATION TO SERVICE USERS, VOLUNTEERS AND STAFF. THIS WILL BE ACHIEVED USING A RANGE OF METHODS, I.E. ISSUE BASED PROGRAMMES, INFORMAL WORKSHOPS, PRACTICAL TRAINING AND EDUCATIONAL COURSES.
Area of benefit
SOUTH CORNWALL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window