Financial history HOME START NORTHAMPTON

Charity number: 1116665
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £104.71k £178.23k £154.90k £122.55k £160.29k
Total expenditure £121.54k £120.34k £107.82k £157.19k £172.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.13k £9.98k N/A £17.40k £1.25k